blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0821217

EP0821217 - ROTATING THROTTLE POSITION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.03.2005  [2005/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/15]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [1998/05]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAIE, Takeo
18-15, Kouyou 2-chome
Fukui-shi, Fukui 910 / JP
02 / ASAI, Keiichi
13-8, Joutou 2-chome
Fukui-shi, Fukui 910 / JP
03 / TSUJIOKA, Kazuyuki
1-10, Uenocho
Fukui-shi, Fukui 910 / JP
04 / KOMATSU, Satoshi
16-8, Katsumi 3-chome
Fukui-shi, Fukui 910 / JP
[1998/05]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard, et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/05]Kügele, Bernhard, et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date97900124.510.01.1997
[1998/05]
WO1997JP00043
Priority number, dateJP1996000001910.01.1996         Original published format: JP 1996
JP1996001254929.01.1996         Original published format: JP 1254996
JP1996001631501.02.1996         Original published format: JP 1631596
JP1996003028919.02.1996         Original published format: JP 3028996
[1998/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9725589
Date:17.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0821217
Date:28.01.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0821217
Date:07.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.07.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01B7/30, H01C13/00
[1998/05]
CPC:
G05G1/38 (EP,US); F02D11/106 (EP,US); G01B7/30 (EP,US);
G01D5/165 (EP,US); H01C10/32 (EP,US); H01C13/00 (EP,US);
F02D2009/0294 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [1998/05]
TitleGerman:POSITIONSDETEKTOR FÜR EINE ROTIERENDE DROSSELKLAPPE[1998/05]
English:ROTATING THROTTLE POSITION SENSOR[1998/05]
French:DETECTEUR DE POSITION POUR UNE SOUPAPE D'ETRANGLEMENT ROTATIVE[1998/05]
Entry into regional phase03.09.1997Translation filed 
29.09.1997National basic fee paid 
29.09.1997Search fee paid 
29.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
07.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2004Fee for grant paid
05.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES18.07.2004
[2005/02]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4355293  (DRISCOLL BARRY J) [Y] 1,11 * column 3 - column 5 *;
 [A]US4616504  (OVERCASH DONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * claims 1-11 *;
 [A]EP0632253  (CTS CORP [US]) [A] 1,11 * page 3 - page 5 *;
 [A]EP0663585  (ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS CO [US]) [A] 1,11* claims 1-9 *;
 [Y]DE19518340  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [Y] 1,11 * claims 1-11 *
International search[A]JPS6296505U  ;
 [A]JPH0637705U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.