|
03.12.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
24.10.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.08.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2012 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
14.03.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2012 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Communication of loss of rights: deficiency according to Art. 108 EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2007 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.12.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.11.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.10.2006 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.06.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
07.12.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
03.08.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.07.1998 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1998 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.11.1997 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1997 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
16.09.1997 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
16.09.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
24.07.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
22.04.1997 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |