EP0912374 - ABSORBING BODY AND COMBINATION OF AN ABSORBING BODY AND CAR BODY PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Hannoversche Strasse 1 D-37075 Göttingen / DE | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSUKA, Kunio 4-24-55-204, Takanawa, Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97900575.8 | 08.01.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997EP00046 | Priority number, date | JP19960184643 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18464396 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802335 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912374 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912374 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/045, B60J5/04, F16L11/14 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
B60J5/0444 (EP,US);
B60R21/045 (KR);
B60J5/0443 (EP,US);
B60R19/00 (EP,US);
B62D21/15 (EP,US);
F16F7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | ABSORPTIONSKÖRPER UND KOMBINATION EINES ABSORPTIONSKÖRPERS MIT FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIETEILEN | [1999/18] | English: | ABSORBING BODY AND COMBINATION OF AN ABSORBING BODY AND CAR BODY PARTS | [1999/18] | French: | CORPS ABSORBANT ET ASSOCIATION D'UN CORPS ABSORBANT AVEC DES PARTIES DE LA CARROSSERIE D'UN VEHICULE | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 23.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 03.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3974467 (TOBITA SUSUMU, et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0561211 (WITZENMANN METALLSCHLAUCHFAB [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 42; figure - *; | [X]US5325893 (TAKAGI AKINOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 5 - line 17 *; | [X]DE19512525 (DORNIER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,9-13 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 14; figures 1,7,8; claims 1-5 *; | [A] - AUTOMOTIVE ENGINNERING, (197904), vol. 87, no. 4, page 56, XP002044419 [A] 1,14 * figure 4 * |