EP0820580 - HEATED PRESSURE TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/05] | IMPROVED HEATED PRESSURE TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY | ||
[2002/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MKS INSTRUMENTS, INC. Six Shattuck Road Andover Massachusetts 01810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states MKS INSTRUMENTS, INC. Six Shattuck Road Andover Massachusetts 01810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANDORF, Robert, C. 135 Winchester Street Newton Highlands, MA 02161 / US | 02 /
DEMONE, Archibald, J. 7 Patten Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | 03 /
THOMAS, Frank, W. P.O. Box 155 Lunenburg, MA 01642 / US | 04 /
BLANKENSHIP, Steven, D. 23 Clifford Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97902938.6 | 13.01.1997 | [1998/05] | WO1997US00586 | Priority number, date | US19960585535 | 16.01.1996 Original published format: US 585535 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726518 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820580 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820580 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01L7/00, G01L19/04 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
G01L19/0092 (EP,US);
G01L7/00 (KR);
G01L19/04 (EP,US);
G01L19/14 (EP,US);
G01L9/0072 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/05] | G01L7/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/05] | Title | German: | BEHEIZTE DRUCKWANDLERANORDNUNG | [2002/44] | English: | HEATED PRESSURE TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY | [2002/44] | French: | ENSEMBLE TRANSDUCTEUR DE PRESSION CHAUFFE | [2002/44] |
Former [1998/05] | BEHEIZTE DURCHWANDLERANORDNUNG | ||
Former [1998/05] | IMPROVED HEATED PRESSURE TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [1998/05] | ENSEMBLE TRANSDUCTEUR DE PRESSION CHAUFFE AMELIORE | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1997 | Search fee paid | 02.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02079663.7 / EP1316785 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.04.2003 | FR | 16.04.2003 | IT | 16.04.2003 | LI | 16.04.2003 | NL | 16.04.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 16.04.2003 | |
FR | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 16.04.2003 | |
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
NL | 16.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4176557 (JOHNSTON SAMUEL A [US]) [Y] 1,13,14,28,30,37 * column 4 - column 8 *; | [Y]US5172586 (REED DONALD B [US]) [Y] 1,13,14 * column 3 - column 6 *; | [Y]EP0280811 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]) [Y] 28,30,37 * column 3 - column 9 *; | [A]US5423479 (NICHOLS GALEN E [US]) [A] 1,13,14,28,30,37 * column 4 - column 11 *; | [A]EP0651424 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,13,14,28,30,37 * column 8 - column 14 * | International search | [X]US4176557 (JOHNSTON SAMUEL A [US]) | Examination | US5271277 |