|
13.04.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
21.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.12.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.10.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.09.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
11.09.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.09.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2002 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2002 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2002 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.09.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |