EP0880670 - GRIDDED MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robell, Glenn 2621 S.W. 167th Place Seattle, WA 98166 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Robell, Glenn 2621 S.W. 16th Place Seattle, WA 98166 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Lee, Nicholas John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97906531.5 | 13.02.1997 | [1998/49] | WO1997US02057 | Priority number, date | US19960599986 | 14.02.1996 Original published format: US 599986 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730325 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880670 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/00, E04C2/04, G01B3/02 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
E04C2/043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/49] | G01B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/49] | Title | German: | QUADRIERTES MESSSYSTEM FÜR BAUMATERIALIEN | [1998/49] | English: | GRIDDED MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS | [1998/49] | French: | SYSTEME DE MESURE QUADRILLE POUR MATERIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION | [1998/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 14.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4858402 (PUTZ HELMAR [AT]) [Y] 1-16 * column W *; | [Y]US4924644 (LEWIS DAVID L [US]) [Y] 1-16* column W * | International search | [A]US752617 ; | [A]US2375427 (PHILIP MANNINO); | [Y]US4827621 (BORSUK PHILIP [US]); | [Y]US4858402 (PUTZ HELMAR [AT]); | [A]US5282317 (CARTER DORIS [US], et al) | by applicant | US5206965 | US5265342 |