EP0823161 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTION OF ERRORS IN MULTIPLE-WORD COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka, 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka, 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | ||
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states HAL COMPUTER SYSTEMS, INC. 1315 Dell Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Takeshi 1255 San Tomas Aquino Road 214 San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 02 /
WICKI, Thomas Martin Apartment 7 275 Ventura Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
HELLAND, Patrick James 22401 N.E. 25th Way Redmond, WA 98053 / US | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Sunderland, James Harry, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97906560.4 | 12.02.1997 | [1998/07] | WO1997US02192 | Priority number, date | US19960603923 | 22.02.1996 Original published format: US 603923 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731446 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823161 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823161 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H03M13/00 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H03M13/03 (EP,US);
H04L1/0083 (EP,US);
H04L69/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR FEHLERERKENNUNG BEI MEHRWORTKOMMUNIKATION | [1998/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTION OF ERRORS IN MULTIPLE-WORD COMMUNICATIONS | [1998/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETECTER DES ERREURS DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS MULTIMOTS | [1998/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 30.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Request for further processing for: | 24.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4271520 (COOMBES DANIEL J, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 27 * * figure - *; | [A] - SUBRAHMANYAM DRAVIDA ET AL, "ERROR DETECTION AND CORRECTION OPTIONS FOR DATA SERVICES IN B-ISDN", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (19911201), vol. 9, no. 9, pages 1484 - 1495, XP000267538 [A] 1,2 * see sections III, V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.108685 |