EP1003373 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING RESPIRATORY DEPRESSION AND ATTENDANT SIDE EFFECTS OF MU OPIOID COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ardent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 104 Sierra Drive Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27514 / US | [2001/38] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states DELTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 104 Sierra Drive Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Kwen-Jen 2476 Foxwood Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 02 /
MCNUTT, Robert, W., Jr. Apartment B-9 700 Morreene Road Durham, NC 17705 / US | 03 /
PETTIT, Hugh, O. 106 Wyatts Pond Lane Cary, NC 27513 / US | 04 /
BISHOP, Michael, J. 235 Lochridge Drive Durham, NC 27713 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea, et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr., et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae, Dr., et al Elkington & Fife, Beacon House, 113 Kingsway London WC2B 6PN / GB | ||
Former [2000/22] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910777.8 | 01.10.1997 | [2000/22] | WO1997US17852 | Priority number, date | US19970887312 | 03.07.1997 Original published format: US 887312 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901033 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1003373 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003373 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/13, A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61K38/08, A61P25/00 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/38] | A61K31/13, A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61K38/08 | ||
Former IPC [2000/22] | A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/46, A61K31/40, A61K31/445, A61K31/55 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/22] | Extension states | AL | 22.12.1999 | LT | 22.12.1999 | LV | 22.12.1999 | RO | 22.12.1999 | SI | 22.12.1999 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER ATMUNGSDEPRESSIONEN UND BEGLEITENDER NEBENMWIRKUNGEN VON MU-OPIOID-VERBINDUNGEN | [2000/22] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING RESPIRATORY DEPRESSION AND ATTENDANT SIDE EFFECTS OF MU OPIOID COMPOUNDS | [2000/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES PERMETTANT D'ATTENUER LA DEPRESSION RESPIRATOIRE ET LES EFFETS SECONDAIRES DES COMPOSES OPIOIDES MU | [2000/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 22.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 04.05.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2004 | BE | 11.02.2004 | CH | 11.02.2004 | FI | 11.02.2004 | FR | 11.02.2004 | IT | 11.02.2004 | LI | 11.02.2004 | NL | 11.02.2004 | DK | 11.05.2004 | GR | 11.05.2004 | SE | 11.05.2004 | DE | 12.05.2004 | ES | 22.05.2004 | PT | 11.07.2004 | IE | 01.10.2004 | LU | 01.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
FR | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
IE | 01.10.2004 | ||
LU | 01.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
FR | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
IE | 01.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
IE | 01.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
IE | 01.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
ES | 22.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 11.02.2004 | |
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 11.02.2004 | |
SE | 11.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0415693 (ARIZONA TECH DEV [US]) [X] 7-9,16 * column 5, line 4 - line 12 * * figure - * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 36 * * claims 1,8,9 *; | [Y]WO9315062 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [Y] 1-3,6-24 * abstract * * formula (I) * * page 12 - page 24 * * page 24, line 21 - line 28 * * page 27, line 9 - line 19 * * page 29, line 30 - page 30, line 4 *; | [Y]WO9504051 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-24 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - line 10 * * formulae (I) and (II) * * page 14, line 21 - line 24 * * page 16, line 10 - line 18 *; | [X]WO9602545 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM FARMA [IT], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 26 - line 34 * * page 8, line 11 - line 20 *; | [X]US5574159 (CHANG KWEN-JEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-24 * abstract * * formula (I) * * column 13, line 50 - line 58 * * table A *; | [DX]WO9636620 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM SPA [IT], et al) [DX] 1-4,7-10,13-16 * formula (I) * * page 7, line 14 - line 22 * * claim - *; | [DX]WO9710230 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM SPA [IT], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,7-9,13-16 * formula (I) * * page 1, line 20 - line 27 *; | [E]WO9746240 (DELTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [E] 1-3,6-24 * abstract * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 21 * * formula (I) * * page 12, line 19 - page 14, line 14 * * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 17 * * example - *; | [A] - ERSPAMER V ET AL, "DELTORPHINS: A FAMILY OF NATURALLY OCCURRING PEPTIDES WITH HIGH AFFINITY AND SELECTIVITY FOR OPIOID BINDING SITES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19890701), vol. 86, no. 13, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5188 - 5192, XP000033899 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.13.5188 | International search | [X] - DATABASE CAPLUS ON STN, DEP. PHARMACOLOGY, UNIVERSITY MICHIGAN, (Ann Arbor, MI), Document No. 121:271967, NEGUS S. et al., "Behavioral Effects of the Systemically Active Delta Opioid Agonist BW373U86 in Rhesus Monkeys"; & J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., 270(3), 1994, 1025-1034. |