EP0878043 - METHOD OF DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A SWITCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUERSCHMIDT, Peter Weissenburger Strasse 6c D-91126 Schwabach / DE | 02 /
BEIERL, Ottmar Hirschberg 28 D-91086 Aurachtal / DE | 03 /
BULST, Wolf-Eckhart Hermann-Pünder-Strasse 15 D-81739 München / DE | 04 /
MAGORI, Valentin Limburgstrasse 17 D-81539 München / DE | 05 /
OSTERTAG, Thomas Sankt-Quirin-Weg 2 D-85464 Finsing / DE | 06 /
REINDL, Leonhard Edlingerstrasse 74 D-83071 Stephanskirchen / DE | 07 /
SCHOLL, Gerd Neustätter Strasse 3 D-80636 München / DE | 08 /
SCZESNY, Oliver Platanenweg 7 D-85609 Aschheim / DE | 09 /
LORENZ, Dieter Gärtnerstrasse 1b D-12207 Berlin / DE | [1998/47] | Application number, filing date | 97914073.8 | 20.01.1997 | [1998/47] | WO1997DE00093 | Priority number, date | DE1996103461 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19603461 | [1998/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728590 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0878043 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878043 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/065, H01H9/16 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
H02B13/065 (EP,US);
H01H9/168 (EP,US);
H02B13/0356 (EP,US);
H01H2009/0061 (EP,US);
H01H2300/03 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STELLUNGSERFASSUNG EINES SCHALTGERÄTS | [1998/47] | English: | METHOD OF DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A SWITCHING DEVICE | [1998/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA POSITION D'UN APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION | [1998/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DD269040 (ZITTAU ING HOCHSCHULE [DD]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document * [Y] 6,10; | [X]FR2388391 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 5 * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [PX]DE19547524 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4945256 (TADA SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 45 *; | [A]EP0298069 (SPRECHER ENERGIE OESTERREICH [AT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 25 * * column 4, line 10 - line 34 * * claim 9 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO9313495 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 6,10 * abstract * * page 18, line 20 - page 19, line 27 *; | [DA]DE9420199U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 6,10 |