EP0885427 - METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A RECOGNITION DICTIONARY TO DISTINGUISH BETWEEN PATTERNS THAT ARE DIFFICULT TO DISTINGUISH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company P.O. Box 10301 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94303-0890 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWATANI, Takahiko 3-515, 1950-21 Mutsuura-cho, Kawagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schoppe & Zimmermann Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97914856.6 | 05.03.1997 | [1998/52] | WO1997US03387 | Priority number, date | JP19960047850 | 06.03.1996 Original published format: JP 4785096 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733250 | Date: | 12.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885427 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0885427 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
G06F18/22 (EP,US);
G06F18/00 (KR);
G06F18/214 (EP);
G06F18/2453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINES ERKENNUNGSWÖRTERBUCHS, SO DAS ÄHNLICHE MUSTER BESSER UNTERSCHIEDEN WERDEN KÖNNEN | [1998/52] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A RECOGNITION DICTIONARY TO DISTINGUISH BETWEEN PATTERNS THAT ARE DIFFICULT TO DISTINGUISH | [1998/52] | French: | METHODE D'OPTIMISATION D'UN DICTIONNAIRE DE RECONNAISSANCE PERMETTANT DE DISTINGUER ENTRE DES MOTIFS DIFFICILES A DISTINGUER | [1998/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - TAKAHIKO KAWATANI, "HANDPRINTED NUMERALS RECOGNITION BY LEARNING DISTANCE FUNCTION", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, (19940901), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 62 - 71, XP000483410 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - D. BECKER ET J SCHÜRMANN, "Zur verstärkten Berücksichtigung schlecht erkennbarer Zeichen in der Lernstichprobe", WISSENSCHAFTLICHE BERICHTE AEG-TELEFUNKEN, (1972), vol. 45, no. 1/2, XP002032446 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |