|
28.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
08.07.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2003 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2003 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Description |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Description |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.02.2003 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1998 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1998 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1998 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.1998 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1998 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.04.1997 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |