|
20.08.2014 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2013 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
47 |
|
14.11.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.10.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.07.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.07.2011 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.04.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2005 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.06.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.1999 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |