EP0886468 - SHOEING SYSTEM FOR REDUCING SHOCK IN HORSES' HOOVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luber, Josef Egerer Strasse 46 92224 Amberg / DE | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Wasmeier, Alfons, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Wasmeier, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wasmeier & Graf Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97919264.8 | 12.03.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997DE00472 | Priority number, date | DE1996204676U | 14.03.1996 Original published format: DE 29604676 U | DE1996214112U | 13.11.1996 Original published format: DE 29614112 U | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733468 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0886468 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886468 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01L7/02, A01L7/00, A01L7/04 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
A01L7/02 (EP,US);
A01L7/00 (EP,US);
A01L7/04 (EP,US);
A01L7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1999/01] | Title | German: | BESCHLAGSYSTEM ZUM REDUZIEREN VON PRELLUNGEN BEI PFERDEHUFEN | [1999/01] | English: | SHOEING SYSTEM FOR REDUCING SHOCK IN HORSES' HOOVES | [1999/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE FERRAGE POUR REDUIRE LES CHOCS DANS LES SABOTS DES CHEVAUX | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.01.2000 | SE | 12.01.2000 | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 12.01.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5180017 (ALAGNA SAMUEL M [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * column 3, lines 34-37; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3430358 (CATTANEO GIUSEPPE) [A] 1,3,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]AT393932B (MAYERHOFER RICHARD [AT]); | [A]DE221008 (INNERHOFER); | [A]US5343957 (CHAPMAN LARRY L [US]); | [A]US5029648 (STEPHENS DENNIS N [US]); | [A]DE41393 (ROLAPPE) |