EP0895915 - BRAKING FORCE CONTROLLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/06] | BRAKING FORCE CONTROLLING DEVICE | ||
[2003/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Hiroaki, Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyotacho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Satoshi, Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyotacho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1999/06] | Winter, Brandl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 97919681.3 | 24.04.1997 | [1999/06] | WO1997JP01435 | Priority number, date | JP19960108180 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: JP 10818096 | [1999/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741018 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895915 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895915 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/12, B60T8/32 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B60T7/12 (EP,US);
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T8/3275 (EP,US);
B60T8/4836 (EP,US);
B60T8/4854 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/31] | B60T13/66, B60T7/12, B60T8/32 | ||
Former IPC [1999/06] | B60T13/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/06] | Title | German: | BREMSKRAFTSTEUERGERÄT | [1999/06] | English: | BRAKING FORCE CONTROLLING APPARATUS | [2003/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE LA FORCE DE FREINAGE | [1999/06] |
Former [1999/06] | BRAKING FORCE CONTROLLING DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1998 | Translation filed | 23.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 27.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4217409 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 5 * | International search | [A]JPH0776267 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]JPH07165038 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) | by applicant | JPH04121260 |