EP0894089 - NOVEL HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS HAVING ANTIDIABETIC, HYPOLIPIDAEMIC, ANTIHYPERTENSIVE PROPERTIES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. 7-1-27, Ameerpet Hyderabad 500 016 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. 7-1-27 Ameerpet Hyderabad 500 016 / IN | ||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states DR. REDDY'S RESEARCH FOUNDATION 7-1-27 Ameerpet Hyderabad, 500 016 Andhra Pradesh / IN | ||
For all designated states Reddy-Cheminor, Inc. 66 South Maple Avenue Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHRAY, Vidya, Bhushan Plot No. 986, Road No. 50, Jubilee Hills Hyderabad-500033, Andhra Pradesh / IN | 02 /
LOHRAY, Braj, Bhushan Plot No. 986, Road No. 50, Jubilee Hills Hyderabad-500033, Andhra Pradesh / IN | 03 /
BAJJI, Ashok, Channaveerappa Plot 31, J.P.N. Nagar, Bollaram Road, Miyapur Hyderabad-500050, Andhra Pradesh / IN | 04 /
ALLA, Sekar, Reddy Plot 19, J.P.N. Nagar, BollaramRoad, Miyapur Hyderabad-500050, Andhra Pradesh / IN | 05 /
RAMANUJAM, Rajagopalan, 28, Vishaal Towers 8-3-682, Navodaya C., Yellareddy Guda Hyderabad-500873, Andhra Pradesh / IN | 06 /
CHAKRABARTI, Ranjan Flat No. 104, Ravi Teja Apt., 283/3RT, S.R. Nagar Hyderabad-500038, Andhra Pradeash / IN | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/05] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97922610.7 | 02.05.1997 | [1999/05] | WO1997US07416 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741121 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894089 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894089 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0894089 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, A61K31/425, C07D417/12, // (C07D417/14, 277:00, 311:00, 207:00) | [1999/05] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1999/05] | Title | German: | NEUE HETEROZYKLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN MIT ANTIDIABETISCHEN, HYPOLIPIDDAEMISCHEN UND BLUTDRUCKSENKENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN | [1999/05] | English: | NOVEL HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS HAVING ANTIDIABETIC, HYPOLIPIDAEMIC, ANTIHYPERTENSIVE PROPERTIES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM | [1999/05] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES HETEROCYCLIQUES PRESENTANT DES PROPRIETES ANTIDIABETIQUES, HYPOLIPIDEMIANTES, ANTIHYPERTENSIVES, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.01.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0745600 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [PX] 1 * see claim 1; Examples 1-134, 1-135, 1-230, 2-134, 2-135, 2-139 * * Formula (VI), page 195; Formula (IX), page 198 * [X] 10; | [X]EP0645387 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * see claim 1; Table 25, p. 56; Table 35, p. 71 * * see compounds (6), (13), (14); Table 10, p. 31 *; | [X]EP0676398 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 1,10 * see claim 1; compounds 1-134, 1-135, 1-136, 1-148, 1-155, 1-160, 2-9, 4-44 * * see compounds of formula (VI),(IX),(X) *; | [DY]EP0528734 (ADIR [FR]) [DY] 1 * examples 1-3 *; | [YD]US5037842 (GOLDSTEIN STEVEN W [US]) [YD] 1 * example 2 * | [Y] - G. DE NANTEUIL ET AL., "Euglygaemic and Biological Activities of Novel Thiazolidine-2,4-dione Derivatives", ARZNEIMITTEL FORSCHUNG/DRUG DESIGN, (1995), vol. 45, no. II, pages 1176 - 1181, XP002037304 [Y] 1 * table 1 * |