|
12.11.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
02.04.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
02.04.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.09.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
06.03.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.07.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.12.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.09.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
40 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
52 |
|
12.04.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
10.11.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1999 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.01.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
12.02.1998 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
10 |