EP0922271 - PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEAL, Christopher, Henry 16 Hintlesham Close, Stowmarket Suffolk, IP14 2PF / GB | 02 /
GIFFORD, Maurice, Merrick 1 Dickinson Terrace, Kesgrave, Ipswich Suffolk, IP5 7GR / GB | 03 /
McCARTNEY, David, John 5 South Close, Ipswich Suffolk IP4 2TH / GB | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Nash, Roger William BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Nash, Roger William BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, Holborn Centre, 8th Floor, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97925152.7 | 06.06.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997GB01524 | Priority number, date | GB19960011787 | 06.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9611787 | GB19960021900 | 18.10.1996 Original published format: GB 9621900 | EP19970302580 | 15.04.1997 Original published format: EP 97302580 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746978 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0922271 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0922271 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, A61B3/12 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
A61B3/1216 (EP,US);
G07C9/00 (KR);
G06V10/143 (EP,US);
G06V30/142 (EP,US);
G06V40/19 (EP,US);
G07C9/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/24] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON PERSONEN | [1999/24] | English: | PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION | [1999/24] | French: | APPAREIL D'IDENTIFICATION PERSONNELLE | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Request for further processing for: | 21.02.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4109237 (HILL ROBERT B) [Y] 1,2,19-24,29,30,32 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 40 *; | [YA]DE3040009 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 6,34 * page 7, line 21 - page 9, line 33 * [A] 1,2,5,7-11,26,31-33; | [A]EP0126549 (EYE D DEV II LTD [US]) [A] 1,2,5-11,26,29-34 * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - page 8, line 22 *; | [A]WO8605018 (FLOM LEONARD, et al) [A] 1,2,15,29,31,33* abstract *; | [YA]US4834528 (HOWLAND HOWARD C [US], et al) [Y] 19-21 * column A; figure -; claim - * [A] 1,31,33; | [Y]US4993068 (PIOSENKA GERALD V [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,14,15,18,22-24,28-33 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 3, line 28 - column 8, line 68 *; | [XA]WO9205736 (FAIRVILLE MEDICAL OPTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-11,19-21,26 * abstract * * page 13, line 4 - page 18, line 35 * [A] 3,4,6,31-34; | [YA]FR2690329 (BOUCOBZA FABIEN [FR]) [Y] 31,33 * abstract * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 4 * [A] 1-4; | [XY]US5359669 (SHANLEY CHARLES W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,29-33 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 40 * * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 26 * [Y] 6,14,15,18,28,34; | [A] - RADKE, "Auf einen Blick", FUNKSCHAU, MUNCHEN DE, (198701), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 34 - 36, XP002022145 [A] 1,2,19-21 * the whole document * |