EP0901422 - MOTOR VEHICLE POWER TRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROVER GROUP LIMITED International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park Warwick Warwickshire CV34 6RG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states ROVER GROUP LIMITED International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park Warwick, Warwickshire CV34 6RG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NESBITT, David, Charles 6 Church Lees, Bishops Tachbrook Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV339RQ / GB | 02 /
TICKLE, David, John 15 Albert Street, Old Milverton, Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 6BB / GB | 03 /
WOOLMER, Clive, David 75 Broomfield Road, Earlsdon Coventry CV5 6JY / GB | 04 /
EBREY, John, Samuel 20 Ivor Road, Redditch Worcestershire B97 4PE / GB | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Farrow, Robert Michael, et al Land Rover Patent Department (53G16/4) Banbury Road Lightthorne Warwickshire CV35 0RG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Farrow, Robert Michael, et al Rover Group Limited Patent Department Gaydon Test Centre Banbury Road Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 ORG / GB | Application number, filing date | 97926092.4 | 05.06.1997 | [1999/11] | WO1997GB01515 | Priority number, date | GB19960011855 | 06.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9611855 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746406 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901422 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901422 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/346 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
B60K17/346 (EP,US);
B60K17/08 (EP,US);
B60K17/22 (EP,US);
B60K5/02 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/11] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTRANG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [1999/11] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE POWER TRAIN | [1999/11] | French: | GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR POUR VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [1999/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 12.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.05.2000 | CH | 10.05.2000 | ES | 10.05.2000 | FI | 10.05.2000 | GR | 10.05.2000 | IT | 10.05.2000 | LI | 10.05.2000 | NL | 10.05.2000 | IE | 05.06.2000 | LU | 05.06.2000 | DK | 10.08.2000 | PT | 10.08.2000 | SE | 10.08.2000 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/39] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
FI | 10.05.2000 | ||
GR | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
NL | 10.05.2000 | ||
IE | 05.06.2000 | ||
LU | 05.06.2000 | ||
DK | 10.08.2000 | ||
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
FI | 10.05.2000 | ||
GR | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
NL | 10.05.2000 | ||
IE | 05.06.2000 | ||
DK | 10.08.2000 | ||
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
FI | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
NL | 10.05.2000 | ||
IE | 05.06.2000 | ||
DK | 10.08.2000 | ||
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
FI | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
NL | 10.05.2000 | ||
IE | 05.06.2000 | ||
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
ES | 10.05.2000 | ||
FI | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
IE | 05.06.2000 | ||
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
FI | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
IE | 05.06.2000 | ||
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
FI | 10.05.2000 | ||
IE | 05.06.2000 | ||
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
FI | 10.05.2000 | ||
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | BE | 10.05.2000 | |
PT | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 10.05.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0179991 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,12,14,20,21,24 * the whole document *; | [A]US4805720 (CLENET ALAIN J-M [US]) [A] 14,16,17 * column 3, line 37 - line 42; figures 1,4 ** column 3, line 48 - line 51 *; | [A]FR2695880 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,6,7,11-14,20,21,24 * the whole document * |