|
26.01.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
28.06.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2010 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2007 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Notice concerning a request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2002 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Decision on interlocutory revision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1998 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Communication of international applications |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.1998 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |