EP0910279 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COLLECTING BLOOD FROM AN UMBILICAL CORD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA 747 Fifty Second Street Oakland, CA 94609-1809 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Children's Hospital Medical Center of Northern California 747 Fifty Second Street Oakland, CA 94609-1809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUYPERS, Franciscus, A. 1519 Everett Street El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | 02 /
COLE, Robert, B. 2519 Alamo Country Circle Alamo, CA 94507 / US | 03 /
MEYST, Richard, P. 28755 Canyon Road Valley Center, CA 92082 / US | 04 /
GORTON, Lanny, A. 10302 Viacha Drive San Diego, CA 92124 / US | 05 /
WRIGHT, James, I. 19142 Mesa Drive Villa Park, CA 92861 / US | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/17] | 01 /
KUYPERS, Franciscus, A. 1519 Everett Street El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | ||
02 /
COLE, Robert, B. 3100 Stonegate Alamo, CA 94507 / US | |||
03 /
MEYST, Richard, P. 28755 Canyon Road Valley Center, CA 92082 / US | |||
04 /
GORTON, Lanny, A. 10302 Viacha Drive San Diego, CA 92124 / US | |||
05 /
WRIGHT, James, I. 19142 Mesa Drive Villa Park, CA 92861 / US | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/17] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97927641.7 | 14.05.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997US08226 | Priority number, date | US19960017402P | 14.05.1996 Original published format: US 17402 P | US19960742438 | 30.10.1996 Original published format: US 742438 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742872 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910279 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0910279 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/15 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
A61M1/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/150038 (EP,US);
A61B5/150045 (EP,US);
A61B5/150068 (EP,US);
A61B5/150213 (EP,US);
A61B5/150221 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/17] | A61B5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BLUTABNAHME AUS EINER NABELSCHNUR | [2002/34] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COLLECTING BLOOD FROM AN UMBILICAL CORD | [1999/17] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RECUPERER LE SANG A PARTIR D'UN CORDON OMBILICAL | [1999/17] |
Former [1999/17] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BLUTABNAHME AUS EINEM NABELSTRANG | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 25.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2004/31] | DE | 02.12.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5053025 (KNIPPSCHEER HERMANN [US]) [A] 1-4,8,57,60,61,50-52,56,36-39,47,25-28,31,12,14,15 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 25 * * column 3, line 11 - line 59 * * column 4, line 19 - line 43 * * column 6, line 1 - line 41 * * column 8, line 7 - line 35 *; | [A]WO9203180 (CRYO CELL INT [US]) [A] 1-5,8,10-16,60,61,53,56-58,48,50,52,38,39,47,31,33-36,25-28,30 * page 3, line 4 - page 6, line 11 * * page 11, line 4 - line 10 * * page 24, line 14 - page 25, line 10 * * page 37, line 12 - page 38, line 33 * * page 39, line 8 - page 40, line 28 *; | [XA]WO9216150 (OB TECH [US]) [X] 1-5,7,10,25-30 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 15 * * page 3, line 35 - page 6, line 11 * [A] 47,53,56,60,61; | [A]US5342328 (GROSSMAN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,60,61,38,56,57,28-30,35,16,24-26 * column 2, line 19 - line 34 * * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 37 *; | [PXA]US5575796 (KING ERIC M [US], et al) [PX] 1-5,7 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 36 * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 49 * * column 6, line 5 - line 22 * [A] 56,60,61,47,52,53[X] 40,10,25-30 |