EP0850613 - EXCREMENT COLLECTING BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcare Co., Ltd. 21-10, Kyoshima 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Alcare Co., Ltd. 21-10, Kyoshima 1-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Tetsuya, Haimu Matsuno 201 6-3, Nishishinagawa 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
SANADA, Hiromi 100, Ho, Iwademachi Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 920-01 / JP | 03 /
KONYA, Chizuko 3-127, Shintatemachi Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 920 / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Michelis & Preissner, Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97929547.4 | 07.07.1997 | [1998/27] | WO1997JP02348 | Priority number, date | JP19960195611 | 05.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19561196 | JP19960312727 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31272796 | [1998/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801094 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850613 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/441, A61F5/445 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
A61F5/441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/27] | Title | German: | BEUTEL ZUR AUFNAHME VON EXKREMENTEN | [1998/27] | English: | EXCREMENT COLLECTING BAG | [1998/27] | French: | POCHE A EXCREMENTS | [1998/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1998 | Translation filed | 24.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 24.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/17] | 18.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5411496 (HOMA JOSEPH) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * the whole document * [Y] 8; | [X]US5185007 (MIDDAUGH JAMES F ET AL) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [Y]US5234419 (BRYANT PETER L ET AL) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [XA]US3690320 (RIELY PHYLLIS E) [X] 1 * column 7, line 21 - line 65; figure - * [A] 9 | International search | [A]JPH0666646U ; | [A]JPH05176950 ; | [A]JPS62179456 |