EP0850496 - TRANSMISSION DEVICE WITH OMNIDIRECTIONAL ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL D'ETUDES SPATIALES 2, Place Maurice Quentin 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL D'ETUDES SPATIALES 2, Place Maurice-Quentin 75001 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEZ, Hubert 8, rue du Bocage F-31490 Léguevin / FR | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97932866.3 | 09.07.1997 | [1998/27] | WO1997FR01243 | Priority number, date | FR19960008601 | 10.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9608601 | [1998/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801920 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850496 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850496 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/36, H01Q11/08 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
H01Q11/08 (EP,US);
H01Q1/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1998/27] | Title | German: | SENDEVORRICHTUNG MIT RUNDSTRAHLENDER ANTENNE | [1998/27] | English: | TRANSMISSION DEVICE WITH OMNIDIRECTIONAL ANTENNA | [1998/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EMISSION A ANTENNE OMNIDIRECTIONNELLE | [1998/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2953786 (KRAUSE LLOYD O) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 3 - column 9, line 70; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US3263233 (ERICH SPITZ) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE1441599 (CHU LAN JEN) [A] 1 * figures 1-3; claims 1-9 *; | [A]DE1541461 (CSF) [A] 1* figures 1-4; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0320404 (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 32 - column 3, line 27; figures 1A-2A * |