EP0912596 - PLANT PLASTID DIVISION GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Nevada University of Nevada - School of Medicine, Dept. of Pharmacology, Mail Stop 318 Reno, NV 89557 / US | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERYOUNG, Katherine, W. 4135 Longknife Road Reno, NV 89509 / US | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97933198.0 | 27.06.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997US11287 | Priority number, date | US19960020959P | 28.06.1996 Original published format: US 20959 P | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800436 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912596 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C12N15/82, C07K14/415 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8269 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/18] | C07H21/04, C12N15/82 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | PFLANZLICHE GENE ZUR REGULIERUNG DER PLASTIDTEILUNG | [1999/18] | English: | PLANT PLASTID DIVISION GENES | [1999/18] | French: | GENES DE PLANTES REGULANT LA DIVISION DES PLASTES | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2000 | 30.06.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - OSTERYOUNG, "Arabidopsis homologs of bacterial cell division protein FTSZ are likely components of the plastid division machinery", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (19960727), vol. 111, no. 2 suppl., page 43, XP001055223 [PX] 1-15 * the whole document * | [T] - OSTERYOUNG ET AL., "Chloroplast division in higher plants requires members of two functionally divergent gene families with homology to bacterial ftsZ", THE PLANT CELL, (199812), vol. 10, page 1991-2004, XP002189096 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.10.12.1991 | International search | [X] - "CONSERVED CELL AND ORGANELLE DIVISION", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19950810), vol. 376, doi:10.1038/376473b0, ISSN 0028-0836, page 473/474, XP002909858 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/376473b0 | [A] - BEALL B, LOWE M, LUTKENHAUS J, "CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BACILLUS SUBTILIS HOMOLOGS OF ESCHERICHIA COLI CELL DIVISION GENES FTSZ AND FTSA", Journal of Bacteriology, American Society for Microbiology, US, US, (19881001), vol. 170, no. 10, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4855 - 4864, XP002909859 |