EP0912934 - METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING INTERFACE DEFINITION LANGUAGE-DEFINED DATA STRUCTURES BETWEEN HETEROGENEOUS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/18] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING INTERFACE DEFINITION LANGUAGE-DEFINED DATA STRUCTURES BETWEEN HETEROGENEOUS SYSTEMS | ||
[2003/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 724 Solutions Software Inc. 1221 State Street Suite 200 Santa Barbara, CA 93101 / US | [2003/25] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states TANTAU Software, Inc. 110 Wild Basin Road Suite 160 Austin, TX 78746 / US | ||
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Tandem Computers Incorporated 10435 N. Tantau Avenue, LOC. 200-16 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOFIELD, Andrew Lindenbuehl 27 CH-6330 Cham / CH | [2003/37] |
Former [1999/18] | 01 /
SCHOFIELD, Andrew Lindenbuehl 27 CH-6330 Cham / US | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Josef-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97934069.2 | 10.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997US11883 | Priority number, date | US19960680203 | 11.07.1996 Original published format: US 680203 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802810 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912934 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912934 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/465 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN VON IN EINER SCHNITTSTELLENDEFINITIONSSPRACHE DEFINIERTEN DATENSTRUKTUREN ZWISCHEN HETEROGENEN SYSTEMEN | [2003/27] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING INTERFACE DEFINITION LANGUAGE-DEFINED DATA STRUCTURES BETWEEN HETEROGENEOUS SYSTEMS | [2003/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT DE STRUCTURES DE DONNEES DEFINIES PAR UN LANGAGE DE DEFINITION D'INTERFACE ENTRE DES SYSTEMES HETEROGENES | [2003/27] |
Former [1999/18] | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN VON IN EINER SCHNITTSTELLENDEFINITIONSSPRACHE DEFINIERTEN DATENSTRUKTUREN ZWISCHEN HETEROGENEN SYSTEMEN | ||
Former [1999/18] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING INTERFACE DEFINITION LANGUAGE-DEFINED DATA STRUCTURES BETWEEN HETEROGENEOUS SYSTEMS | ||
Former [1999/18] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT DE STRUCTURES DE DONNEES DEFINIES PAR UN LANGAGE DE DEFINITION D'INTERFACE ENTRE DES SYSTEMES HETEROGENES | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 28.01.2004 | NL | 28.01.2004 | SE | 28.04.2004 | ES | 09.05.2004 | [2006/12] |
Former [2004/46] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3886522 (BARTON ROBERT S, et al)[A] 1,11,17; | [A]EP0381645 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,11,17 * abstract *; | [A] - NEUFELD G ET AL, "AN OVERVIEW OF ASN.1", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (19920201), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 393 - 415, XP000249379 [A] 1,11,17 * abstract * * page 404, line 9 - page 409, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(92)90014-H | [A] - CHAPPELL D, "A TUTORIAL ON ABSTRACT SYNTAX NOTATION ONE (ASN.1)", OPEN SYSTEMS DATA TRANSFER, (19861201), vol. 25, pages 1 - 13, XP000564222 [A] 1,11,17 * page 9, line 19 - page 13, line 22 * | Examination | - ORB 2.0 RFP Submission, OMG TC Document 94.9.32, published 1994 | - Instant CORBA, by Robert Orfali et. al., Wiley Computer Publishing, published 1997, pp. 85-91 | - Inside CORBA, by Thomas J. Mowbray et. al., Addison Wesley, published 1997, pp. 62-64, 72-75 | - The Common Object Request Broker: Architecture and Specification, Revision 1.2, Draft 29, OMG Document 93.xx.y (93.12.43), publ. 1993/94 |