EP1012706 - SYSTEM FOR ALLOWING I/O PROCESSOR TO OPERATE UNDER DIFFERENT TRANSFER ALGORITHMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics for Imaging, Inc. 2855 Campus Drive San Mateo, California 94403 / US | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUMER, Marc 3860 West Naughton Avenue Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 02 /
ANDO, Wayne 937 Lake Tahoe Court San Jose, CA 95123 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler, Patentanwälte, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97935129.3 | 24.07.1997 | [2000/26] | WO1997US13142 | Priority number, date | US19960716555 | 18.09.1996 Original published format: US 716555 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812630 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012706 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/42, G06F13/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G06F9/3879 (EP,US);
G06F13/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEM DAS EINEM I/O PROZESSOR ERLAUBT UNTER VERSCHIEDENEN TRANSFERALGORITHMEN ZU OPERIEREN | [2000/26] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ALLOWING I/O PROCESSOR TO OPERATE UNDER DIFFERENT TRANSFER ALGORITHMS | [2000/26] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT A UN PROCESSEUR ENTREE/SORTIE DE FONCTIONNER AVEC DIFFERENTS ALGORITHMES DE TRANSFERT | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 16.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 13.07.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5057997 (CHANG TAI-LIN [US], et al); | [Y]US5345567 (HAYDEN CLIFFORD O [US], et al); | [Y]US5357617 (DAVIS GORDON T [US], et al); | [YP]US5574873 (DAVIDIAN GARY G [US]); | [YP]US5588120 (SHITARA YASUHARU [JP], et al) |