blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0921890

EP0921890 - METHOD OF WELDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRI TOOL INC.
3806 Security Park Drive
Rancho Cordova, CA 95742-6990 / US
[1999/24]
Inventor(s)01 / FLOOD, Dale, A.
3548 Falkirk Way
El Dorado Hills, CA 95762 / US
02 / PORTER, Michael, R.
2581 Raleigh Way
El Dorado Hills, CA 95762 / US
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date97935327.312.08.1997
[1999/24]
WO1997US13928
Priority number, dateUS1996069588612.08.1996         Original published format: US 695886
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9806529
Date:19.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0921890
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0921890
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2000
ClassificationIPC:B23K9/167, B23K33/00
[2000/45]
CPC:
B23K33/006 (EP,US); B23K9/167 (KR); B23K9/0286 (EP,US);
B23K2101/06 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/24]B23K9/167
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/24]
TitleGerman:SCHWEISSVERFAHREN[1999/24]
English:METHOD OF WELDING[1999/24]
French:PROCEDE DE SOUDAGE[1999/24]
Entry into regional phase10.02.1999National basic fee paid 
10.02.1999Search fee paid 
10.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/24]
13.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2003Fee for grant paid
05.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.05.2003
BE07.05.2003
CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
DK07.08.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
LU12.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]AT07.05.2003
BE07.05.2003
CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
DK07.08.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
LU12.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
Former [2004/28]AT07.05.2003
BE07.05.2003
CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
DK07.08.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
Former [2004/23]AT07.05.2003
CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
DK07.08.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
Former [2004/05]AT07.05.2003
CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
Former [2004/03]AT07.05.2003
CH07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
Former [2004/02]CH07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
Former [2004/01]CH07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
SE07.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE07.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]  - ING. HERMANN SCHECK, WÜRZBURG, "Bau eines Rundofens für die Petrochemie", SCHWEISSEN UND SCHNEIDEN, (1969), vol. 21, no. 9, pages 430 - 431, XP002147802 [A] 1-4 * page 431, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4; figure 1 *
International search[A]US2871336  (LOBOSCO ROSCOE R, et al);
 [A]US3223819  (HANSKARL WITTEMANN);
 [A]US3309491  (JACOBS CHARLES T)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.