Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0915894

EP0915894 - NUCLEOTIDE ANALOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
333 Lakeside Drive Foster City
CA 94404 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]For all designated states
GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARIMILLI, Murty, N.
4789 Ridgewood Drive
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
02 / CUNDY, Kenneth, C.
3802 Naughton Avenue
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
03 / DOUGHERTY, Joseph, P.
856 Castro Street
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
04 / KIM, Choung, U.
1750 Elizabeth Street
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
05 / OLIYAI, Reza
1262 Crestview Drive
San Carlos California 94070 / US
06 / STELLA, Valentino, J.
1324 Lawrence Avenue
Lawrence, KS 66049 / US
[1999/47]
Former [1999/20]01 / ARIMILLI, Murty, N.
4789 Ridgewood Drive
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
02 / CUNDY, Kenneth, C.
3802 Naughton Avenue
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
03 / DOUGHERTY, Joseph, P.
856 Castro Street
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
04 / KIM, Choung, U.
1750 Elizabeth Street
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
05 / OLIYAI, Reza
116 Victory Circle
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
06 / STELLA, Valentino, J.
1324 Lawrence Avenue
Lawrence, KS 66049 / US
Representative(s)Barz, Peter
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]Barz, Peter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2
80803 München / DE
Application number, filing date97936257.125.07.1997
[1999/20]
WO1997US13244
Priority number, dateUS1996068683826.07.1996         Original published format: US 686838
[1999/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9804569
Date:05.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0915894
Date:19.05.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998
[1999/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0915894
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)International search reportEP05.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07F9/6561, A61K31/675, C07F9/6512
[1999/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/20]
TitleGerman:Nukleotidanaloga[2002/26]
English:NUCLEOTIDE ANALOGS[1999/20]
French:ANALOGUES DE NUCLEOTIDES[1999/20]
Former [1999/20]NUKLEOTID-ANALOGE
Entry into regional phase22.01.1999National basic fee paid 
22.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/20]
02.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2002Fee for grant paid
25.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9507920  (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [DY] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9209611  (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [DY] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [DY]EP0481214  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [DY] 1-32 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - LINDAHL A ET AL, "Synthesis of an acryloxymethyl prodrug of the inositol phosphate.alpha.-trinositol", J. CARBOHYDR. CHEM. (JCACDM,07328303);96; VOL.15 (5); PP.549-554, PERSTORP PHARMA;PERSTORP; S-284 80; SWED. (SE), XP002043027 [Y] 1-32 * the whole document *