EP0925098 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A BOOT ONTO A SPORTING GOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [1999/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTE, Pierre-Alain 18, rue Vaugelas F-74000 Annecy / FR | [1999/26] | Application number, filing date | 97937643.1 | 20.08.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997FR01507 | Priority number, date | FR19960010457 | 21.08.1996 Original published format: FR 9610457 | [1999/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9807479 | Date: | 26.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925098 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/086, A63C9/08 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
A63C10/106 (EP,US);
A63C10/10 (EP,US);
A63C10/103 (EP,US);
A63C10/18 (EP,US);
A63C9/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1999/26] | Title | German: | BINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES SCHUHES AN EINEM SPORTARTIKEL | [1999/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING A BOOT ONTO A SPORTING GOOD | [1999/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UNE CHAUSSURE SUR UN ENGIN DE SPORT | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/20] | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]AT321781B (FRANZ HERUNTER) [A] 1 * page 4, lines 30-40; figures 11,12 *; | [A]DE2359309 (GUMPP RUDOLF) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 3-22; figure . *; | [A]DE2749904 (WELZEL GERHARD DR) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2483793 (SKF AB [SE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4846492 (BATAILLE JEAN [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE29601721U (HUBER GERALD [DE], et al) [A] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29608660U (TYROLIA FREIZEITGERAETE [AT]) [A] 1* figure - * |