EP0925568 - MAN-MACHINE INTERFACE FOR AIRPORT TRAFFIC CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDEVOORDE, Jean-Claude Dijkstrasse 9 B-1820 Steenkokkerzeel / BE | 02 /
CASTOR, Robert Eschenstrasse 38 D-85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | 03 /
JELU, André Astridvest 57 B-3300 Tienen / BE | [1999/26] | Application number, filing date | 97941856.3 | 29.08.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997DE01896 | Priority number, date | DE1996135679 | 03.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19635679 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810398 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925568 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925568 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/06 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
G06Q99/00 (EP,US);
G08G5/06 (EP,KR,US);
G08G5/0026 (EP,US);
G08G5/0043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/26] | Title | German: | MENSCH-MASCHINE-SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR FLUGHAFEN-VERKEHRSKONTROLLZWECKE | [1999/26] | English: | MAN-MACHINE INTERFACE FOR AIRPORT TRAFFIC CONTROL | [1999/26] | French: | INTERFACE HOMME-MACHINE POUR LE CONTROLE DE LA CIRCULATION SUR UN AEROPORT | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 31.08.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 14.09.2001 | Appeal received No. T0265/02 | 21.12.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.06.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4365315 (JAMNIK DONALD J) [Y] 40 * column A *; | [Y]FR2634945 (VIDEOCOLOR [FR]) [Y] 1-40 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 1 *; | [Y]FR2668012 (FRINDEL JEAN) [Y] 1,35,36 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5211463 (KALMANASH MICHAEL H [US]) [Y] 34 * column A *; | [Y]DE4216281 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [Y] 2,3,6,28,32,37 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4304562 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]) [Y] 16-18,27,28 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2289556 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 2,7,8,11,12 * abstract * * page 7, line 2 - page 13, line 1; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0714082 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0725283 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19504923 (MEDIATEC GES FUER MULTIMEDIALE [DE]) [Y] 2-5,33-35,39 * abstract *; | [E]WO9732291 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-3,6-19,21-24,26-28,31* the whole document *; | [A] - MONZEL F G ET AL, "SURFACE MOVEMENT GUIDANCE AND CONTROL SYSTEM", ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION, (19930101), pages 51 - 59, XP000360408 | [A] - KIESEWALTER ET AL., "COMPUTERIZED TAXIWAY CONTROL SYSTEMS IMPROVE AIRPORT CAPACITY UTILIZATION", ENGINEERING AND AUTOMATION, (19910901), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 8 - 13, XP000272524 | by applicant | US5262784 | US5374932 | US5485151 |