|
30.07.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.06.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
22 |
|
25.04.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.03.2012 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.12.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.12.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.09.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
15.05.2009 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.02.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
17 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
43 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Filing of a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.1999 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.07.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1999 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.1999 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
17.09.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
17.09.1998 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |