|
28.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.02.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.01.2007 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.09.2006 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2006 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2006 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.04.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.05.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.03.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |