EP0930956 - SILICON CARBIDE ABRASIVE WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2001 [2001/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box No. 15138 Worcester, Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELDON, David, A. 13 Hayward Glen Drive Millbury, MA 01527 / US | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 97945505.2 | 01.10.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997US17965 | Priority number, date | US19960727889 | 09.10.1996 Original published format: US 727889 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9815387 | Date: | 16.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930956 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930956 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/14 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
B24D3/14 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/30] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFSCHEIBE AUS SILIKONKARBID | [1999/30] | English: | SILICON CARBIDE ABRASIVE WHEEL | [1999/30] | French: | MEULE ABRASIVE EN CARBURE DE SILICIUM | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PA]RU2078678 ; | [A]JPS5439292 ; | [A]SU458427 ; | [A]JPS62292365 ; | JPS62292365 [ ]; | [A]US3986847 (BALSON PETER CHARLES) [A] 1,7 * column W * * column 7, line 33 - line 36 *; | [Y]US5094672 (GILES JR JAMES H [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-8 * the whole document * * column 5, line 65 - line 68 *; | [Y]US5095665 (NAGATA AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5204289 (MOH KYUNG H [US]) [A] 2* the whole document *; | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 47, Database accession no. 97-510804 (47), XP002052708 & RU2078678 C 19970510 (ABRAZIVY I SCHLIFOVANIE STOCK CO.) [PA] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 18, Database accession no. 79-34379B (18), XP002052709 & JPS5439292 A 19790326 (NORITAKE CO. LTD.) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 36, Database accession no. 75-59946W (25), XP002052710 & SU458427 A 19750310 (AS. USSR. KOLSK RARE) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880527), vol. 12, no. 182, Database accession no. (M - 702), & JP62292365 A 19871219 (MIZUHO KENMA TOISHI K.K.) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 05, Database accession no. 88-032859 (05), & JPS62292365 A 19871216 (MIZUHO KENMATOISHI) [ ] * abstract * |