|
05.09.2012 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Refusal of request for correction after grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
140 |
|
01.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2010 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
22.04.2010 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Translation of priority document |
Appeal |
40 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Translation of priority document |
Appeal |
40 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
51 |
|
14.10.2009 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.09.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.02.2008 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2007 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.08.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.1998 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
210 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |