EP0932794 - RENOVATION APPARATUS FOR PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EST Einlauf-Sanierungstechnik GmbH Holbeinstrasse 21 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [1999/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIETRICH, Herbert Holbeinstrasse 21 D-88212 Ravensburg / DE | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Raue, Reimund Patentawalt Gutenbergstrasse 3 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Raue, Reimund Gutenbergstr. 3 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97948776.6 | 22.10.1997 | [1999/31] | WO1997EP05823 | Priority number, date | DE1996144466 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19644466 | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9819098 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932794 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/162 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
F16L55/163 (EP);
F16L55/16455 (EP);
F16L55/179 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/31] | Title | German: | SANIERUNGSGERÄT ZUM SANIEREN VON KANALROHREN | [1999/31] | English: | RENOVATION APPARATUS FOR PIPES | [1999/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE RENOVATION DE CANALISATIONS | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 24.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/29] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9507433 (AMKRETE UK LTD; SHENTON ROBERT ALFRED (GB); SHENTON MICHAEL JOHN (GB)) [X] 1,4,6,7 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraph 5 * * page 17, paragraph 3 * * claims 1,20,21 * * figures 2,3,6 * [A] 2,3,5,11,12; | [XA]WO9319321 (BARRY BROS SPEC SERVICES) [X] 1,5,21 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2,4,6; | [XA]EP0115993 (COOPETANCHE SA) [X] 1,20,21 * abstract * * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 19 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 2-6,14; | [XA]DE4409886 (BILFINGER BERGER BAU) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5,19,21; | [A]WO9305334 (MORGENEGG ALFRED) [A] 1,2,6,11,18 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * claim 1 * * figures 2,6 *; | [A]EP0413494 (TOA GROUT KOGYO CO ;ISEKI KAIHATSU KOKI (JP)) [A] 1,5,9,15 * abstract * * claims 1-5 * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE9202199U (JT ELEKTRONIK) [A] 1,3,14,15 * claims 1-4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0025204 (HIMMLER KUNSTSTOFF TECH) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 6 *; | [PA]DE19519708 (GATZ KLAUS WERNER DIPL ING) [PA] 1,6,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - line 37 * * column 3, line 32 - line 43 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0621434 (SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1,19 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0126648 (BRITISH GAS CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0518174 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [A] 1 * abstract * * claim 1 * |