EP1023595 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING MEASUREMENT SIGNALS TO OBTAIN A VALUE FOR A PHYSICAL PARAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perceptron, Inc. 47827 Halyard Drive Plymouth, MI 48170-2461 / US | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIXON, John, W. Apartment 14 1309 Huron River Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | 02 /
WHITE, Jeffrey, S. Apartment 9 2104 Glencoe Hills Drive Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | 03 /
LAPLANT, Frederick, P. 213 Miller Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 97951456.9 | 21.11.1997 | [2000/31] | WO1997US21308 | Priority number, date | US19960003171P | 22.11.1996 Original published format: US 3171 P | US19960003200P | 22.11.1996 Original published format: US 3200 P | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822814 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023595 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/08, G01N29/10, G01B11/06, G01B17/02, G01N29/24 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
G01B11/0666 (EP,US);
G01B17/025 (EP,US);
G01N21/1702 (EP,US);
G01N29/0681 (EP,US);
G01N29/225 (EP,US);
G01N29/2418 (EP,US);
G01N29/348 (EP,US);
G01N29/42 (EP,US);
G01N29/46 (EP,US);
G01N29/50 (EP,US);
G01N2291/014 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0228 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0231 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0237 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0251 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02818 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02854 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0421 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/31] | G01N29/08, G01N29/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/31] | Title | German: | METHODE UND GERÄT ZUR SIGNALVERARBEITUNG ZUR ERLANGUNG EINES PHYSIKALISCHEN PARAMETERS | [2000/31] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING MEASUREMENT SIGNALS TO OBTAIN A VALUE FOR A PHYSICAL PARAMETER | [2000/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX DE MESURE POUR L'OBTENTION D'UNE VALEUR CONCERNANT UN PARAMETRE PHYSIQUE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 12.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.1999 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5504695 (YOSHIDA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-11,20,22-30 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 27, line 6 *; | [X]US3994586 (SHARKINS ALLEN J, et al) [X] 1,3-10,20,22-29 * column 1, line 6 - column 7, line 56 * * abstract *; | [X]JPS5880506 ; | [A]US4709357 (MAKI JR VOLDI E [US]) [A] 1-8,20-27 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 7, line 5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830804), vol. 007, no. 176, Database accession no. (P - 214), & JP58080506 A 19830514 (HITACHI ZOSEN KK) [X] 1,20 * abstract * | International search | [X]US3580056 (WARNER ROBERT F); | [X]US4379226 (SICHLING GEORG H, et al); | [X]US4452082 (MIWA HIROHIDE [JP]); | [X]US4625556 (TSUKAHARA YUSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US4704905 (ARORA ARVIND [US]); | [X]US4709357 (MAKI JR VOLDI E [US]); | [X]US5271274 (KHURI-YAKUB B T [US], et al); | [XP]US5663502 (NAGASHIMA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) |