|
21.11.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
124 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2000 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1999 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1998 |
Invitation to file a duly signed covering letter |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
02.04.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.1998 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
18.03.1998 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
29 |