EP0867873 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/40] | Optical recording medium and optical disk apparatus | ||
[2007/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kashigawi, Toshiyuki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kawakubo, Osamu c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakaoki, Ariyoshi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kaneko, Masahiko c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105116.2 | 20.03.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | JP19970072439 | 25.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7243997 | JP19970185130 | 10.07.1997 Original published format: JP 18513097 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0867873 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0867873 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867873 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007, G11B7/013, G11B7/24, // G11B7/135 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/24067 (KR);
G11B7/1374 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/24053 (KR);
G11B7/2533 (KR);
G11B7/2585 (KR);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
G11B7/263 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2007/0133 (KR);
G11B2007/13727 (EP,US);
G11B2220/232 (KR);
G11B2220/235 (KR);
G11B2220/2525 (KR);
G11B2220/2537 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1998/40] | G11B7/24, G11B7/135, // G11B7/007 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/38] |
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2007/51] | English: | Optical recording medium | [2007/51] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique | [2007/51] |
Former [1998/40] | Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium und optisches Plattengerät | ||
Former [1998/40] | Optical recording medium and optical disk apparatus | ||
Former [1998/40] | Support d'enregistrement optique et appareil de disque optique | Examination procedure | 15.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH0397134 ; | [Y]JPH02158932 ; | [DA]JPH03225650 ; | [A]US4175145 (FECHTER HENRY G [US]) [A] 8 * column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *; | [Y]US4957776 (HIGUCHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0473785 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,25 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0518213 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [Y] 22 * page 6, line 48 - line 52 *; | [Y]DE19542022 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 21 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5530641 (KANEHIRA JUN [JP]) [Y] 8 * column 1, line 57 - line 61 *; | [Y]EP0729141 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 9-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0751508 (IBM [US]) [Y] 6 * page 5, line 29 - line 31 *; | [YA]EP0762405 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 16-18 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [XY] - YAMAMOTO, K ET AL, "0.8-NA two element objective lens for the optical disk", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS., TOKYO JP, (199701), vol. 36, no. 1b, pages 456 - 459, XP002084439 [X] 1,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6,8-19,21-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.36.456 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910717), vol. 015, no. 281, Database accession no. (P - 1228), & JP03097134 A 19910423 (SONY CORP) [Y] 2 * abstract * [A] 1,25 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900905), vol. 014, no. 409, Database accession no. (P - 1101), & JP02158932 A 19900619 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 23 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920107), vol. 16, no. 003, Database accession no. (P - 1294), & JP03225650 A 00000000 [DA] * abstract * | [A] - MARCHANT, ALAN B, "Cover sheet aberrations in optical recording", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, Arlington, Virginia, US, (19830608), vol. 421, pages 43 - 49, XP002084440 | [A] - MARCHANT, A, Optical Recording, READING, US, ADDISON WESLEY, (1992), XP002084441 [A] * page 125 - page 131 * |