EP0872513 - Expandable styrene polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glück, Guiscard, Dr. An den Mühlwegen 11 55129 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Klaus, Dr. Im Bügen 9 67281 Kirchheim / DE | 03 /
Henn, Rolf, Dr. Hardtwaldring 74 68723 Oftersheim / DE | 04 /
Wassmer, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Pfalzring 99 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 05 /
Gausepohl, Hermann, Dr. Medardusring 74 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 06 /
Knoll, Konrad, Dr. Horst-Schork-Strasse 184 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07 /
Batscheider, Karl-Heinz Ludwigshafener Strasse 29 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | [1998/43] | Application number, filing date | 98106427.2 | 08.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | DE1997116572 | 19.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19716572 | [1998/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872513 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872513 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/16, C08F287/00, C08L25/06, C08L51/04, // (C08L25/06, 53:02) | [1998/43] | CPC: |
C08J9/16 (EP,US);
C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08J2351/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/06, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/26] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Expandierbare Styrolpolymerisate | [1998/43] | English: | Expandable styrene polymers | [1998/43] | French: | Polymères styréniques expansibles | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 24.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9425516 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * claim - *; | [DA]DE4420952 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 52 - line 54; claim - *; | [A]DE4403017 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0069792 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1 * claim - * |