EP0878689 - Injection manufacturing of a folding rule and longitudinal reinforcement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/47] | Folding ruler and method of manufacture thereof | ||
[2000/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYERISCHE MASS-INDUSTRIE ARNO KELLER GMBH Rosengasse 12 91217 Hersbruck / DE | [1998/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Hans Zolltafel 16 91217 Hersbruck / DE | 02 /
Dengler, Herbert Breslauer Strasse 5 91217 Hersbruck / DE | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Götz, Georg Alois Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 35 45 90017 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Götz, Georg Alois Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 35 45 90017 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1998/47] | Götz, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Götz, Küchler, Dameron Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 93 40 90103 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108599.6 | 12.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | DE1997120486 | 16.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19720486 | [1998/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0878689 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0878689 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878689 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/06, G01B3/00, B29C45/16 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
B29C45/1676 (EP);
B29C45/16 (EP);
B29C45/1635 (EP);
G01B3/004 (EP);
G01B3/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/47] | G01B3/06, G01B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/18] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spritz Herstellungen eines Gliedermasstabs und Längsverstärkung | [2000/05] | English: | Injection manufacturing of a folding rule and longitudinal reinforcement | [2000/05] | French: | Fabrications par injection d'un mètre pliant et renforcement longitudinal | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/47] | Gliedermassstab aus Kunststoff und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1998/47] | Folding ruler and method of manufacture thereof | ||
Former [1998/47] | Mètre pliant et procédé pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 26.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 22.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1139020 (EMILE VERON) [Y] 8,9 * page 2, line 45 - line 90; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]US3934352 (QUENOT MICHEL) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-5 * [A] 9; | [A]US5461795 (KOK TAT C [HK]) [A] 6,7* the whole document *; | [DY]DE4442875 (BAYERISCHE MASINDUSTRIE ARNO K [DE]) [DY] 8,9 * the whole document * |