EP0889226 - Combustion engine with turbocharger and exhaust gas recirculation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Tillmann Frühlingsweg 1 73663 Berglen / DE | 02 /
Gärtner, Uwe Ziegelweg 6/1 73630 Ramshalden / DE | [1999/01] | Application number, filing date | 98111384.8 | 20.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997128353 | 03.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728353 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889226 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889226 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889226 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
F02B75/22 (EP,US);
F02B37/005 (EP,US);
F02B37/007 (EP,US);
F02B37/12 (EP,US);
F02M26/06 (EP,US);
F02M26/07 (EP,US);
F02M26/08 (EP,US);
F02M26/34 (EP,US);
F02B29/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2000/21] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Abgasturbolader und Abgasrückführung | [1999/01] | English: | Combustion engine with turbocharger and exhaust gas recirculation | [1999/01] | French: | Moteur à combustion avec turbocompresseur et recirculation de gaz d'échappement | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9855759 (SOUTHWEST RES INST [US]) [E] 1-3 * abstract * * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 9 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, line 17 * * page 15, line 24 - page 16, line 14; figure 4 *; | [DA]EP0620365 (MAK MASCHINENBAU KRUPP [DE]) [DA] 1-3,6,7 * column 3, line 25 - line 45 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5406796 (HIERETH HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 17; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0620365 | DE4007516 | DE4231218 |