EP0889296 - Furnace car for tiles, in particular roofing tiles and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisenmann Maschinenbau KG (Komplementär: Eisenmann-Stiftung) Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states EISENMANN MASCHINENBAU KG (Komplementär: EISENMANN-Stiftung) Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states EISENMANN MASCHINENBAU KG (Komplementär: EISENMANN-Stiftung) Tübinger Strasse 81 D-71032 Böblingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwerer, Peter Nelkenstrasse 30 71083 Herrenberg / DE | 02 /
Bader, Norbert Siemenstrasse 21 72555 Metzingen / DE | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Ostertag, Ulrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | Fürst, Siegfried Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann & Vogeser Nördliche Ringstrasse 10 73033 Göppingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112357.3 | 03.07.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997128740 | 04.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728740 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889296 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889296 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F27D3/12, F27D5/00, F27D3/00, B28B11/24 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
F27D3/123 (EP);
F27D5/0012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/37] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brennwagen für Ziegel, insbesondere Dachziegel u. dgl | [1999/01] | English: | Furnace car for tiles, in particular roofing tiles and the like | [1999/01] | French: | Chariot de cuisson de carreaux, en particulier tuiles pour la toîture et analogues | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2136100 (NORTON CO) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AP]EP0786636 (KELLER GMBH [DE]) [AP] 2 * column 3, line 23 - line 32; figures 2,3 *; | [A]FR2282978 (LAURAGAIS TUILERIES BRIQ [FR]) [A] 2 * figures 11,12 *; | [A]FR2438809 (STEULER INDUSTRIEWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 2 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US1333472 (DAYTON JAMES S) [A] 2 * figures 4,5; claim - *; | [A]EP0067451 (PETER HUBERTUS DR [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US1441718 (ALBRIGHT DONALD S); | [A]DE4322099 (RIEDHAMMER GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [A]DE3244183 (KELLER GMBH & CO KG) |