EP0911002 - Apparatus for treatment of the tinnitus and hyperacusis. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lux-Wellenhof, Gabriele Feldbergstrasse 33 65830 Kriftel / DE | [1999/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Kindermann Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119502.7 | 15.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | DE19972018503U | 17.10.1997 Original published format: DE 29718503 U | [1999/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911002 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/00 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
H04R25/75 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gerät zur Behandlung von Tinitus und Hyperakusis | [1999/17] | English: | Apparatus for treatment of the tinnitus and hyperacusis. | [1999/17] | French: | Appareil pour le traitement du tintement d'oreille et de l'hyperacousie | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2001 | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |