EP0911521 - Arrangement of lubrication fluid grooves in a rotating drive plate for a swash plate compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minami-dai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Calsonic Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyaji, Toshikatsu c/o Calsonic Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0014 / JP | 02 /
Higashihara, Shinichiro c/o Calsonic Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0014 / JP | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119808.8 | 19.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | JP19970288781 | 21.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28878197 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911521 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911521 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911521 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/10 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
F04B27/1054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/11] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schmierfluidkanäle in der rotierenden Antriebsplatte eines Taumelscheibenkompressors | [1999/17] | English: | Arrangement of lubrication fluid grooves in a rotating drive plate for a swash plate compressor | [1999/17] | French: | Gorges de lubrification dans le support rotatif d'un compresseur à plateau-came | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4008005 (HIRAGA MASAHARU) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5063829 (TAKAO KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 4; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5105728 (HAYASE ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 44 - line 49; figures 8-10 *; | [A]EP0554791 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]US5674054 (OTA MASAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,10 * figures 1,5 * | by applicant | JPH07103138 | US5706716 | US5749712 |