EP0950611 - A superimposable and interpenetrable plastics box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICAV Sas di Militerni & C. Piazzale Cappella Moreri, 1/3 10060 Bricherasio (Torino) / IT | [1999/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cesano, Franco Via Brusiti, 13 bis 10060 San Secondo di Pinerolo (Torino) / IT | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Fiume 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98119893.0 | 21.10.1998 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00322 | 15.04.1998 Original published format: IT TO980322 | [1999/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0950611 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950611 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/04 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
B65D21/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Übereinander und ineinander stapelbare Kunststoffkiste | [1999/42] | English: | A superimposable and interpenetrable plastics box | [1999/42] | French: | Caisse en plastique empilable et emboîtable | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 24.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.05.2003 | FR | 28.05.2003 | IT | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | DE | 29.08.2003 | GB | 21.10.2003 | ES | 22.10.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 28.05.2003 | |
FR | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
GB | 21.10.2003 | ||
ES | 22.10.2003 | ||
Former [2005/27] | BE | 28.05.2003 | |
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
GB | 21.10.2003 | ||
ES | 22.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | BE | 28.05.2003 | |
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
GB | 21.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 28.05.2003 | |
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | NL | 28.05.2003 | |
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 28.05.2003 | |
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1131653 (CONST ELECTRO MECANIQUES D APP) [X] 1-3 * page 2, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; figures 15-21 *; | [XY]DE7435329U (STUCKI KUNSTSTOFFWERK [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * [Y] 4; | [YA]DE4228204 (RIESSELMANN & SOHN [DE]) [Y] 4 * figures 21-24; claim 1 *[A] 1; | [YA]EP0612666 (BEROLINA KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 51; figures 4-7 * [A] 1; | [XAY]EP0680886 (ALLIBERT EQUIPEMENT [FR]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-5; claim 1 * [A] 3 [Y] 4 |