|
23.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
11.07.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.03.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.01.2006 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.01.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.11.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.11.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
04.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1999 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |