EP0937847 - Frame element of window, door or the like with faceplate fixed in a fitting groove [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/34] | Faceplate fixable to a fitting groove, particularly for covering an actuating rod of door, window or the like in at least one part | ||
[2002/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gretsch-Unitas GmbH Baubeschläge Johann-Maus-Strasse 3 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Gretsch-Unitas GmbH Baubeschläge Johann-Maus-Strasse 3 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renz, Walter Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Brucknerstrasse 25 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
Sprenger, Otto Flattichstrasse 17 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | 03 /
Sprenger, Rolf Unterer Schützenrain 12 71229 Leonberg / DE | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121955.3 | 19.11.1998 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | DE1998203088U | 24.02.1998 Original published format: DE 29803088 U | [1999/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937847 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937847 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/00 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
E05C9/004 (EP);
E05C9/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [2000/18] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Holm eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen mit in einer Beschlagnut angeordneter Stulpschiene | [2002/42] | English: | Frame element of window, door or the like with faceplate fixed in a fitting groove | [2002/42] | French: | Elément de cadre de fenêtre, porte ou similaire avec têtière fixée dans un gorge de ferrure | [2002/42] |
Former [1999/34] | An einer Beschlagnut befestigbare Stulpschiene, insbesondere zum Überdecken einer mindestens einteiligen Treibstange eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dgl. | ||
Former [1999/34] | Faceplate fixable to a fitting groove, particularly for covering an actuating rod of door, window or the like in at least one part | ||
Former [1999/34] | Têtière à fixer dans une gorge de ferrure, notamment pour recouvrir une tringle de manoeuvre de porte, fenêtre ou similaire en au moins une partie | Examination procedure | 24.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 13.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2194870 (FRANK GMBH WILH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,16 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 2; figure - *; | [A]DE2407196 (BILSTEIN AUGUST FA) [A] 1-3,10* figure - *; | [PX]EP0843062 (ROTO FRANK AG [DE]) [PX] 1-5,12-16 * column 6, line 1 - column 6, line 19; figure 3 *; | [E]EP0892138 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [E] 1-4,14-16 * column 3, line 32 - column 3, line 54; figure - * |