EP0918207 - Fragmentation-type projectile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [2003/42] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schildknecht, Manfred Dr. Fasanenweg 38 90542 Eckental/Eckenhaid / DE | 02 /
Rieger, Gerald Kleinreuther Weg 49 90408 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Himmert, Rainer Königsberger Strasse 23 91207 Lauf / DE | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122013.0 | 20.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | DE19971053187 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19753187 | [1999/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0918207 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0918207 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918207 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/32 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
F42B12/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/34] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Splittergeschoss | [1999/21] | English: | Fragmentation-type projectile | [1999/21] | French: | Projectile du type à fragmentation | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19648355 (DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO [DE]) [E] 1-15 * column 2, line 15 - line 21; figure 6 *; | [AD]EP0101795 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,4-7,9,15 * page 2, line 19 - page 4, line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0314092 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-5,13,15 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]DE2947165 (FRANCE ETAT) [A] 1,9 * page 10, line 11 - line 18; figure 5 *; | [A]DE129807 (EGGER ET AL.) [A] 1,10,13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE312389 (BAYERISCHES HÜTTENWERK FRITZ NEUMEYER) [A] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3804351 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4664035 (OSOFSKY IRVING B [US]); | [A]GB764292 (VICKERS ARMSTRONGS AIRCRAFT); | [A]US5661254 (STEUER RAIMAR [DE], et al) | by applicant | EP0101795 | DE3804351 |