Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904717

EP0904717 - Assembly for use in a coffee machine for preparing coffee, container and pouch of said assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sara Lee/DE N.V.
Keulsekade 143
3532 AA Utrecht / NL
[1999/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Dijs, Daniel Albertus Jozef
Goethelaan 61
3533 VP Utrecht / NL
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J. , et al
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. , et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date98203309.430.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateNL1997100717130.09.1997         Original published format: NL 1007171
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0904717
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904717
Date:11.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/06
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/13]
TitleGerman:Baueinheit zum Einsatz in einem Kaffeebrühgerät, sowie deren Filterbehälter und Filterbeutel dafür[1999/13]
English:Assembly for use in a coffee machine for preparing coffee, container and pouch of said assembly[1999/13]
French:Unité d'extraction utilisé dans une machine à café, porte-filtre et sachet filtre faisant partie de cette unité[1999/13]
Examination procedure10.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/18]
10.03.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
06.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
21.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2001Fee for grant paid
03.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.07.2006Observations by third parties
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  WITHDRAWN
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
 05  18.11.2004  26.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Kraft Foods Deutschland GmbH
Langemarckstrasse 4-20
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund
Hoffmann Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 06  14.04.2005   
Minges Kaffee GmbH & Co. KG
Industriering 17
96149 Breitengüssbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Josef Heinrich
Vossius & Partner
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/34]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  WITHDRAWN
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
 05  18.11.2004  26.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Kraft Foods Deutschland GmbH
Langemarckstrasse 4-20
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 06  14.04.2005   
Minges Kaffee GmbH & Co. KG
Industriering 17
96149 Breitengüssbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Josef Heinrich
Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2006/13]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  WITHDRAWN
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
 05  18.11.2004  26.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Kraft Foods Deutschland GmbH
Langemarckstrasse 4-20
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 06  14.04.2005   
Minges Kaffee GmbH & Co. KG
Industriering 17
96149 Breitengüssbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Josef Heinrich
Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2006/12]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  WITHDRAWN
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
 05  18.11.2004  26.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Kraft Foods Deutschland GmbH
Langemarckstrasse 4-20
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 06  14.04.2005   
Minges Kaffee GmbH & Co. KG
Industriering 17
96149 Breitengüssbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Josef Heinrich
Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2005/26]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  INTERVENTION
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
 05  18.11.2004  26.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Kraft Foods Deutschland GmbH
Langemarckstrasse 4-20
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 06  14.04.2005   
Minges Kaffee GmbH & Co. KG
Industriering 17
96149 Breitengüssbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Josef Heinrich
Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2005/06]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  INTERVENTION
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
 05  18.11.2004  26.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Kraft Foods Deutschland GmbH
Langemarckstrasse 4-20
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2005/05]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  INTERVENTION
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
 05  18.11.2004  26.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Kraft Foods Deutschland GmbH
Langemarckstrasse 4-20
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 06  14.12.2004   
Rolf Minges
Industriering 17
96149 Breitengüssbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Josef Heinrich
Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2005/02]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  INTERVENTION
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
 05  18.11.2004  26.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Kraft Foods Deutschland GmbH
Langemarckstrasse 4-20
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bachelin, Karl Martin Raimund
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2004/23]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  INTERVENTION
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Morton, Jeremy Spencer
Simmons & Simmons CityPoint One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
Former [2004/19]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  INTERVENTION
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004  16.03.2004  INTERVENTION
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Meade, Richard David
8 New Square Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3QP / GB
Former [2004/18]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  11.03.2004  INTERVENTION
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 04  08.03.2004   
Kraft Foods France
13 Avenue Morane Saulnier
78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR
Opponent's representative
Meade, Richard David
8 New Square Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3QP / GB
Former [2003/20]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 03  24.03.2003  01.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois
Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181
2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, André
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2002/10]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001  10.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Coöperative Inkoopvereniging Integro B.A./Vomar Voordeelmarkt B.V.
Antareslaan 9a/Loggerstraat 7
2132 JE Hoofddorp/1976 CX IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2002/08]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001  07.11.2001  WITHDRAWN
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 02  18.12.2001   
Coöperatieve Inkoopvereniging Intergro B.A.
Antareslaan 9A
2132 JE Hoofddorp / NL
Opponent's representative
Jorritsma, Ruurd
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2001/46]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2001   
Albert Heijn B.V.
Provincialeweg 11
1506 MA Zaandam / NL
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
22.01.2002No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
08.04.2002No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
16.05.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.11.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
22.09.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2004Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.01.2005Date of oral proceedings
21.02.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.02.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.08.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/49]
29.08.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition03.05.2005Appeal received No.  T0452/05
04.07.2005Statement of grounds filed
30.08.2006Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
11.04.2005Appeal received No.  T0452/05
29.08.2006Date of oral proceedings
06.09.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.07.2001
MC30.09.2001
[2004/04]
Former [2002/43]MC30.09.2001
Documents cited:Search[DA]US3620155  (BIXBY GEORGE JR) [DA] 1,2,14,15,24 * column 2, line 50 - line 67; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US3450024  (MARTIN JOHN C) [A] 1 * column 3, line 60 - line 75; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]NL9400837  (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [A] 1-4,16 * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 34; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0249700  (GESEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 5,8,9 * page 11, line 10 - line 35; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE3504441  (GESEN WOLFGANG, et al) [A] 10,16-19,22,23 * abstract *;
 [A]DE9403616U  (MAXS AG [CH]);
 [A]WO9402059  (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 5-7 * page 26, line 9 - line 16; figures 4,6 *
by applicantUS3620155
 US5287797
otherJPS6425029U
 JP64025029K