Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0921183

EP0921183 - Use of cold flow improvers in fuel oil compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/23]Fuel oil compositions
[2010/29]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.10.2010
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineum USA L.P.
1900 East Linden Avenue
Linden, New Jersey 07036 / US
[1999/24]
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.
1900 East Linden Avenue
Linden New Jersey 07036 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Caprotti, Rinaldo
5 Cumnor Rise Road
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 9HD / GB
[1999/23]
Representative(s)Hart, Richard Joseph , et al
Infineum UK Ltd.
Law Department
Milton Hill
P.O. Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Hart, Richard Joseph , et al
Infineum UK Ltd, Law Department, Milton Hill, PO Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Application number, filing date98203458.908.06.1995
[1999/23]
Priority number, dateGB1994001161409.06.1994         Original published format: GB 9411614
[1999/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0921183
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0921183
Date:01.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C10L10/04, C10L1/22, C10L1/18, C10L1/14
[1999/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/23]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Kaltfliessverbesserern in Brennstoffzusammensetzungen[2010/29]
English:Use of cold flow improvers in fuel oil compositions[2010/29]
French:Utilisation d'agents améliorant l'écoulement à froid dans des compositions de carburant[2010/29]
Former [1999/23]Brennstoffzusammensetzungen
Former [1999/23]Fuel oil compositions
Former [1999/23]Compositions d'huile combustible
Examination procedure19.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/23]
10.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2010
15.06.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2010Fee for grant paid
07.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95923299.2  / EP0764198
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.08.2011  06.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Mikulecky, Klaus, et al
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent & License Management Chemicals
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/40]
Opponent(s)01  25.08.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Mikulecky, Klaus
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
07.10.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.12.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
06.12.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.02.2019
21.02.2019Date of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0557/13
29.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
05.05.2017Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2017/18]
31.05.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/22]
28.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
17.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
07.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.06.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 13
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 14
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 15
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB07.06.2015
[2015/36]
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0398101  (BASF AG [DE])
Examination   - DANPING WEI, H.A. SPIKES, "The Lubricity of Diesel Fuels", WEAR, (1986), vol. 111, pages 217 - 235,