|
30.11.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2006 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.10.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.02.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1999 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
13 |